MD HB579 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB955
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (23-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (23-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition against using, selling, possessing, setting, placing, or maintaining a snare trap in Cecil County.
Title
Cecil County - Snare Traps - Repeal of Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (Y: 23 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (23-20) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {510214/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB955 (Carry Over) 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |