MD HB58 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including income from an individual retirement account or a certain annuity within a certain subtraction modification for certain retirement income under certain circumstances; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105969/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement Systems
Taxes - Income
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement Systems
Taxes - Income