MD HB581 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of certain Class B fire fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals for certain testing or training purposes; requiring the use of certain foam for fire fighting training; providing that the Act does not restrict the manufacture, sale, or distribution of certain fire fighting foam or the use of certain fire fighting foam in certain operations; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a certain study; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB420 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 277
Subjects
Environment, Department of the
Fire Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Job Training
Public Safety
Reports
Fire Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Job Training
Public Safety
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 9 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |