MD HB587 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Veterans' Day to be a public school holiday.
Title
Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2019-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |