MD HB590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain members of the Howard County Board of Education be elected by the voters of certain districts and certain members be elected at large by the voters of the county; and applying the Act to the election of the members of the Howard County Board of Education for the term of office that begins December 7, 2020.
Title
Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |