MD HB591 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering penalties applicable to failing to report a lost or stolen regulated firearm.
Title
Public Safety – Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm – Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Floor Amendment 263521/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Floor Amendment 263521/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {138272/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-44) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment {263521/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (45-88) |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB1050 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Theft
Disclosure
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Theft
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 146 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |