MD HB592 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the basic rights afforded to each resident of a comprehensive care facility and an extended care facility; requiring certain individuals to pursue certain assistance from the medical assistance program in a certain manner; requiring a facility to provide a certain written notice as soon as practicable before discharge or transfer under certain circumstances; requiring a facility, under certain provisions of law, to provide at least a 3-day supply of medications needed by the resident at the time of discharge or transfer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 545
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {237372/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-1)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {396689/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0592&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0592f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0592t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0592e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_545_hb0592e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0592_39668901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0592_23737201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0592.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0592_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0764.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0592_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1330.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback