MD HB593 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the term "mortgage lender" to mean a person that is duly licensed under certain provisions of the Financial Institutions Article; clarifying the definition of the term "consumer claim"; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Act be construed as clarifying the Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act and that, with regard to sales of real property to bona fide purchasers, the Act applies only to sales made on or after the June 1, 2019.
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-39) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {483995/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Court of Appeals
Debt Collection
Foreclosure
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Personal Property
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Court of Appeals
Debt Collection
Foreclosure
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Personal Property
Real Property
Rules and Regulations