MD HB595 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the admissibility, under certain circumstances, of a certain report of an approved service provider in a court proceeding to prove a violation of a requirement imposed by a court that the defendant use an ignition interlock system as a sentence, part of a sentence, or condition of probation for a certain violation; etc.
Title
Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {848372/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {182017/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Disclosure
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Evidence
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Reports
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Witnesses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Evidence
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Reports
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Witnesses