MD HB595 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding bladder, kidney, or renal cell cancer to the types of cancer that are considered occupational diseases suffered in the line of duty and are compensable in a certain manner.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-13) (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-13) (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214 |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-13) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Diseases
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation