MD HB599 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the student member of the Baltimore County Board of Education to be elected by certain middle school and high school students in accordance with procedures established by the Baltimore County student councils.
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Selection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 269 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-11) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795561/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |