MD HB6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to refuse to register or reregister, or to refuse to transfer or to suspend the registration of, a motor vehicle for which the person liable for a violation recorded by a vehicle height monitoring system has failed to pay the civil penalty, contest liability, or appear for trial; requiring the State Highway Administration to suspend Baltimore City travel permits and prohibiting the State Highway Administration from issuing the permits on receipt of certain notice; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems - Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-08-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Citations
District Courts
Fines
Law Enforcement
Liability
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Weights and Measures
Baltimore City
Citations
District Courts
Fines
Law Enforcement
Liability
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Weights and Measures