MD HB6 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring telephone companies and commercial mobile radio service (CMRS) providers to keep records of 9-1-1 fees collected and remitted for at least four years after the fees are remitted; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Emergency Number Systems Board, to adopt procedures for auditing surcharge collection and remittance by telephones companies and CMRS providers; providing the Comptroller is entitled to .5% of the fees to cover the expense of conducting audits; authorizing the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB61 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Credit
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Emergency Services
Fees
Privacy
Public Safety
Radio
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Telephones
Utility Regulation
Comptroller
Credit
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Emergency Services
Fees
Privacy
Public Safety
Radio
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Telephones
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 13 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |