MD HB601 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program to allow the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust to accept a commercial rehabilitation credit application for which the proposed rehabilitation work has begun if the rehabilitation work has been approved under the federal historic tax credit; etc.
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Ways and Means |