MD HB601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the programs to be funded by the Universal Service Trust Fund; requiring the Secretary of Information Technology to certify the cost of the programs to be paid by the Universal Service Trust Fund; requiring the Public Service Commission to determine the amount of a specified monthly surcharge; establishing the Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program, operated by the Department of Aging, to regularly call the residence of an eligible participant to verify the participant's ability to receive specified notifications; etc.
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-34) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-34) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-34) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {253295/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Claims
Contracts
Elderly Persons
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Liability
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Telephones
Torts
Utility Regulation
Volunteers
Vulnerable Adults
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Claims
Contracts
Elderly Persons
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Liability
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Telephones
Torts
Utility Regulation
Volunteers
Vulnerable Adults