MD HB602 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring various authorized reserve real estate investments of insurers other than life insurers to be for the accommodation of business; authorizing other reserve investments to include fee-simple or improved leasehold real estate or interests in limited partnerships formed for the development or ownership of fee-simple or leasehold real estate only under certain circumstances; prohibiting the value of certain reserve investments from exceeding certain percentages of the admitted assets of the insurer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Investments of Insurers Other Than Life Insurers - Real Estate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback