MD HB602 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain retired employees of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program under certain circumstances; and requiring the governing body of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to pay certain costs and to make certain determinations with regard to certain retirees under certain circumstances.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB956 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |