MD HB603 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; providing that compliance with a certain federal law and certain federal regulations constitute compliance with certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; altering the maximum interest rates that a certain lender may charge for certain loans; etc.
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Damages
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Financial Institutions
Licenses
Loans
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Damages
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Financial Institutions
Licenses
Loans