MD HB603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the county boards of education in Caroline, Dorchester, Kent, Queen Anne's, and Talbot counties to establish a regional Career and Technical Education (CTE) school to provide career and technical education programs to public high school students in the counties; requiring a regional CTE school to operate under the terms of a certain collective bargaining agreement; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula for certain county boards of education; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {885864/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB794 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Subjects
Caroline County
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dorchester County
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Queen Anne's County
Reports
State Aid
Talbot County
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Dorchester County
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Queen Anne's County
Reports
State Aid
Talbot County