MD HB604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to be the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled; and altering the appointed membership of the Maryland State Library Board to include a blind patron of the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled.
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB326 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Literacy
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Literacy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |