MD HB607 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the eligibility for State retiree health benefits for a retiree of the Judges' Retirement System and the retiree's spouse and dependent children when a retiree of the Judges' Retirement System retired at a mandatory retirement age with less than 5 years of creditable service; and providing for the calculation of a certain State subsidy.
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-48) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (40-91) |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {776280/1 Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
dependents
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Public Officials
Retirement
Safety
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Time
Welfare
Commerce and Business
dependents
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Public Officials
Retirement
Safety
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Time
Welfare
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |