MD HB611 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a parent of a student with a disability to request an independent educational evaluation at public expense under certain circumstances; requiring a local school system to issue a written response approving or denying a parent's request within 30 days; requiring a local school system, on approving the parent's request, to advise the parent of the process for arranging the evaluation; requiring the local school system, on denying the parent's request, to file a certain due process complaint within 30 days; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Education – Individualized Education Programs – Timeline for Independent Educational Evaluations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback