MD HB612 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing specified crimes of manslaughter by motor vehicle or vessel while under the influence of alcohol, under the influence of alcohol per se, impaired by a drug, a combination of drugs, or a combination of one or more drugs and alcohol, or impaired by a controlled dangerous substance; providing a penalty on conviction of imprisonment not to exceed 15 years or a fine not to exceed $5,000 or both; providing for the form of specified charging documents; etc.
Title
Manslaughter by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Under the Influence or Impaired - Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {952616/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Railroads
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Railroads