MD HB615 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain county boards of education seeking State funds for the construction of a new school, or the renovation of or an addition to an existing school that would increase the capacity by more than 100 students, to submit a pedestrian safety plan to the Interagency Commission on School Construction under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to review the plans in consultation with the State Highway Administration; providing for the contents of the plan to ensure safe routes for students to walk or bike to school; etc.
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-20) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {774466/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB615 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Bicycles
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Pedestrians
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sidewalks
Students
Zoning and Planning
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Pedestrians
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sidewalks
Students
Zoning and Planning