MD HB616 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1657
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the compensation of the chair of the Prince George's County Board of Education from $19,000 to $30,000, beginning on or after December 1, 2021; increasing the compensation of the other elected and appointed members of the Board from $18,000 to $25,000, beginning on or after December 1, 2021; and requiring that a student member who completes a full term on the Board, beginning on or after December 1, 2021, be granted a $5,000 scholarship to be applied toward the student's higher education costs.
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarship PG 501-21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1657 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Prince George's County
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Education, Boards of
Prince George's County
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0616?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0616f.pdf |