MD HB62 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying a provision authorizing a certain purchase of eligibility service credit in the Employees' Pension System for certain employment; providing that certain members of the Employees' or Teachers' Pension System who meet certain criteria may continue employment with certain participating employers of the State Retirement and Pension System without incurring a certain break in service following retirement from the Employees' or Teachers' Pension System; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {859730/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0062&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0062f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0062t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0062e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_483_hb0062e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0062_85973001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0062.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0062_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0086.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0062_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0973.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1199.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/ag_letters/hb0062.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback