MD HB625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain requirement regarding the confidentiality of certain proceedings, testimony, and other evidence; prohibiting members and staff of the Commission to Restore Trust in Policing from being required to sign a confidentiality agreement to receive documents or files, altering, from 2019 to 2020, the due date for a report that the Commission is required to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly; and requesting the Governor to appropriate sufficient funds to allow the Commission to complete its work.
Title
Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {662816/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Ethics
Evidence
Governor
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Open Government
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Signatures
Subpoenas
Sunset
Witnesses
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Ethics
Evidence
Governor
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Open Government
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Signatures
Subpoenas
Sunset
Witnesses