MD HB626 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting an increase or decrease in bed capacity from the certificate of need requirement if the increase or decrease will occur in a certain intermediate care facility that has a current license issued by the Secretary of Health, an existing general hospice program that has a current license issued by the Secretary, and certain notice is filed with the Maryland Health Care Commission at least 45 days before increasing or decreasing bed capacity; requiring the Commission to review a certain chapter of the State Health Plan; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Facilities - Change in Bed Capacity - Certificate of Need Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {246288/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback