MD HB627 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of a county to require, by law, owners and operators of certain solar energy property to pay a certain annual fee to the county; requiring counties to distribute a certain amount of a certain fee to a municipality under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of the fee; exempting from the personal property tax certain solar energy property; applying the property tax exemption to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2019-02-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-06HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback