MD HB63 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a participating employer to submit supporting payroll data to the State Retirement Agency regarding a member's contributions at the time contributions are paid to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and providing, for violations of the Act, a 10% penalty of the member contribution due, 10% a year interest on delinquent member contributions until paid, a $250 penalty for each payroll for which supporting data is not submitted, and 10% a year interest on a certain penalty assessed under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {954561/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback