MD HB634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB901
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that, for purposes of provisions of law concerning health insurance, a chamber of commerce may be considered an association; repealing certain provisions of law that apply certain provisions of law governing small group market plans to health benefit plans offered by certain entities; applying the Act to policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Association Health Coverage Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB901 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
SB621 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
SB621 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Laws and Ordinances
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Laws and Ordinances
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 11 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0634?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0634f.pdf |