MD HB635 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a merchant in a certain consumer contract from shortening the period of time during which a consumer may file a civil action at law against a merchant; providing that certain provisions of a consumer contract are void and unenforceable; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-8) (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-8) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {523695/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Penalties and Sentences
Statutes of Limitation
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Penalties and Sentences
Statutes of Limitation
Unfair Trade Practices