MD HB641 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from engaging in sexual contact with an animal; defining "sexual contact with an animal"; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Sexual Contact With an Animal – Aggravated Cruelty to Animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {888773/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {112212/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0641&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0641f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0641t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0641e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_72_hb0641e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0641_11221201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0641_88877301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0641.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0641_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0756.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0641_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1106.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1274.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback