MD HB645 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a local government from requiring an electrical license or an electrical permit to install, maintain, inspect, replace, or service a wireless security system if the wireless security system does not require submission of a fire protection plan review to a local government for compliance with the State or local building code; authorizing a local government to require providers and operators of wireless security systems to comply with certain ordinances and obtain certain registrations or permits; etc.
Title
Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits
Sponsors
Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] |
Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2018-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {253998/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Building Codes
Business Regulation and Occupations
Counties
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Registration
Security Alarms
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Business Regulation and Occupations
Counties
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Registration
Security Alarms
Telecommunications and Information Technology