MD HB646 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the frequency, from at least once every 5 years to on or before October 1 each year, at which the Maryland Health Care Commission is required to adopt a State health plan; requiring the State health plan to be consistent with the Maryland All Payer Model Contract; requiring the Commission to annually or on petition review each State health plan chapter for potential revision and establish at a public meeting a priority order and timeline of the State health plan chapter review and revision; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Care Commission - State Health Plan and Certificate of Need for Hospital Capital Expenditures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {696082/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback