MD HB650 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish an energy storage pilot program; providing that the cumulative size of the projects under the program shall be between 5 and 10 megawatts, with a minimum of 15 megawatt-hours; requiring the Commission to require each investor-owned electric company to solicit offers to develop energy storage projects for various commercial and regulatory models; requiring each investor-owned electric company to submit applications for projects from at least two models; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Storage Pilot Project Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-16) (Y: 120 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (119-16)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {543193/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback