MD HB650 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to designate a certain emergency area under certain circumstances during a certain state of emergency; prohibiting a state of emergency to continue for longer than 30 days under certain circumstances; requiring certain executive orders or proclamations to include the effective date; establishing that an executive order or proclamation that declares a state of emergency is authority for the activation of State compacts, laws, programs, policies, or regulations that require the declared state of emergency; etc.
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-3) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Boundaries
Communications
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Executive Orders
Fuel
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Housing
Interstate Affairs
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Transportation
Communications
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Executive Orders
Fuel
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Housing
Interstate Affairs
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 107.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |