MD HB66 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified entities to administer a microenterprise loan program under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to establish specified standards by regulation; requiring the standards to include specified provisions; authorizing the Department to help conduct specified training; and exempting a microenterprise seeking financial assistance under the Business Development Program from a requirement to demonstrate that the microenterprise project meets a specified financing requirement.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Business
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/4 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2009-09-24 | Pre-filed |