MD HB66 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on specified public land on any Sunday during the spring turkey hunting season in Dorchester County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-5) (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-5) (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-5) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {780014/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-11 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |