MD HB66 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified persons from using, allowing to be used, or selling specified lead wheel weights after January 1, 2020; requiring the State to ensure that no vehicle purchased for the State fleet after January 1, 2019, is equipped with an externally attached lead wheel weight that is composed of greater than 0.1% lead or 0.1% mercury by weight; prohibiting a tire on a vehicle in the State fleet that is balanced or replaced after January 1, 2018, from being equipped with specified lead wheel weights; etc.
Title
Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-39) (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-39) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {493922/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {164633/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {164633/1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-47) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-09-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment, Department of
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Recycling
Rules and Regulations
Environment, Department of
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Recycling
Rules and Regulations