MD HB66 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a train or light engine used in the movement of freight in the same rail corridor as a high-speed passenger or commuter train from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing certain penalties; providing that a railroad company is solely responsible for certain actions of its agents or employees; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures; requiring certain notice be made to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-30) (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {443128/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFloor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)
2019-03-29SenateLaid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFloor Amendment {833729/1 (Senator Hershey)
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (102-30)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {180712/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0066&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0066f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0066t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0066_18071201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0066_83372901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0066_44312802.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0066.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0066_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0574.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0066_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0925.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1012.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback