MD HB660 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup, the purpose of which is to provide certain expertise and to review activities of federal and State agencies related to tick-borne diseases to ensure coordination, minimize overlap, and examine research priorities; requiring the Workgroup to solicit input from certain stakeholders and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit a final report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Data
Diseases
Federal Government
Health, Department of
Insects
Medical Research
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Data
Diseases
Federal Government
Health, Department of
Insects
Medical Research
Public Health
Reports
Sunset