MD HB665 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund to increase legal services in family law cases for certain victims; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring each grantee from the Fund to receive training on the effects of domestic violence, sexual assault, and child abuse; prohibiting a grantee from requesting that an individual waive certain rights as a condition of receiving services; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {922118/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Child Custody
Comptroller
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Governor
Job Training
Legal Aid
Nonprofit Organizations
Privacy
Revenue and Taxes
Sexual Offenses
Treasurers
Victims
Budgets
Child Custody
Comptroller
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Governor
Job Training
Legal Aid
Nonprofit Organizations
Privacy
Revenue and Taxes
Sexual Offenses
Treasurers
Victims