MD HB667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including the crime of stalking in the list of charges to which a certain prohibition against violating a certain condition of pretrial or posttrial release is applicable.
Title
Stalking – Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsors
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] |
Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {542712/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety