MD HB673 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a member of the Board of License Commissioners of Frederick County or a person acting on behalf of the member, a campaign finance entity of the member, or any other campaign finance entity operated in coordination with the member from soliciting, receiving, depositing, or using a contribution while the member is serving on the Board; requiring any campaign finance entity of the member to pay all outstanding obligations before the member begins serving on the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {105264/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback