MD HB674 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the lists of substances designated as controlled dangerous substances under certain schedules under the Maryland Controlled Dangerous Substances Act.
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 298 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 5 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |