MD HB675 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB370
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education and authorizing a nonpublic school, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to require at least two school employees to be trained in recognizing the signs and symptoms of a seizure, administering first aid for a seizure, and administering or assisting with the administration of seizure medication and performing manual vagus nerve stimulation; etc.
Title
Education – Public Schools – Seizure Action Plans
(Brynleigh Act)
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB675 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
SB549 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB549 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Counselors
Counties
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Health
Job Training
Liability
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
School Buses
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Counselors
Counties
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Health
Job Training
Liability
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
School Buses
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0675?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0675f.pdf |