MD HB678 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Prince George's County Planning Board to offer a comprehensive youth sports program and to create a youth sports division as part of the county recreation programs; and requiring the youth sports division to coordinate youth sports programming, leagues, and teams and to incorporate youth sports activities into the county recreation programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 166
2019-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {720015/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback