MD HB682 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that certain persons identified on a certain list are ineligible for certain procurement activities with certain public bodies; requiring the Board of Public Works, on or before December 31, 2019, to use credible information to create a list of persons that are prohibited Russian entities; requiring the Board to update the list every 180 days; requiring the Board, within a certain number of days before adding a person to the list, to provide the person with 90 days' written notice; etc.
Title
Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Associations
Attorney General
Certifications
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Corporations
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Identification
Industry and Technology
International Affairs
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Procurement
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Publications
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Statutes of Limitation
Associations
Attorney General
Certifications
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Corporations
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Identification
Industry and Technology
International Affairs
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Procurement
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Publications
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Statutes of Limitation