MD HB683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain individuals who are members of the Employees' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System from becoming a member of the Optional Retirement Program of the State Retirement and Pension System on or after July 1, 2020.
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB960 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 30 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 30 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 30 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0683?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0683f.pdf |